PA SB237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education; and, in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for definitions, for responsibilities of school entities and for concurrent enrollment agreements.
Title
In terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education; and, in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for definitions, for responsibilities of school entities and for concurrent enrollment agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |