PA SB234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, authorizing assessments for energy improvements in districts designated by municipalities.
Title
Authorizing assessments for energy improvements in districts designated by municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: SB 234 PN 1443, FP (Y: 163 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 234 PN 1443, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: SB 234 PN 1443, FP (Y: 163 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 234 PN 1443, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Act No. 30 |
2018-06-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-05 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-04 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-04 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (163-28) |
2018-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-22 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-01 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2018-01-30 | House | In the House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-8) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |