PA SB200 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 25, 2007 (P.L.342, No.53), known as the Pennsylvania Gaming Economic Development and Tourism Fund Capital Budget Itemization Act of 2007, further providing for limitation on expenditures.
Title
Further providing for limitation on expenditures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-20 | First consideration | |
2009-04-20 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-19 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 203 | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |