PA SB196 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 1, 1988 (P.L.82, No.16), known as the Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority Act, further providing for definitions, for financial assistance and for annual report.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for financial assistance and for annual report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - SB 196 PN 716, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - SB 196 PN 716, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - SB 196 PN 716, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Act No. 16 |
2013-06-19 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-10 | House | Signed in House |
2013-06-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2013-04-15 | House | In the House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |