PA SB180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in ownership of property and legal title and equitable estate, further providing for right to dispose of a decedent's remains; in health care, further providing for example; and, in anatomical gifts, further providing for definitions, providing for scope, further providing for persons who may execute anatomical gift, for persons who may become donees and purposes for which anatomical gifts may be made, for manner of executing anatomical gifts, for rights and duties at death, for requests for anatomical gifts, for use of driver's license or identification card to indicate organ or tissue donation, for The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions, for The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund, for confidentiality requirement and for prohibited activities, providing for promotion of organ and tissue donation, establishing the Donate Life PA Registry, providing for facilitation of anatomical gift from decedent whose death is under investigation, for notification by coroners and medical examiners to district attorneys, for discretionary notification by coroner or medical examiner, for collaboration among departments and organ procurement organizations, for information relative to organ and tissue donation, for requirements for physician and nurse training relative to organ and tissue donation and recovery, for Department of Transportation, for Department of Corrections, for study of organ procurement organizations and for relation to Electronic Signatures in Global and National Commerce Act, repealing provisions relating to corneal transplants and providing for vascularized composite allografts.
Title
In ownership of property and legal title and equitable estate, further providing for right to dispose of a decedent's remains; in health care, further providing for example; and, in anatomical gifts, further providing for definitions, providing for scope, further providing for persons who may execute anatomical gift, for persons who may become donees and purposes for which anatomical gifts may be made, for manner of executing anatomical gifts, for rights and duties at death, for requests for anatomical gifts, for use of driver's license or identification card to indicate organ or tissue donation, for The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions, for The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund, for confidentiality requirement and for prohibited activities, providing for promotion of organ and tissue donation, establishing the Donate Life PA Registry, providing for facilitation of anatomical gift from decedent whose death is under investigation, for notification by coroners and medical examiners to district attorneys, for discretionary notification by coroner or medical examiner, for collaboration among departments and organ procurement organizations, for information relative to organ and tissue donation, for requirements for physician and nurse training relative to organ and tissue donation and recovery, for Department of Transportation, for Department of Corrections, for study of organ procurement organizations and for relation to Electronic Signatures in Global and National Commerce Act, repealing provisions relating to corneal transplants and providing for vascularized composite allografts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 2048, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 180 PN 2048, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1658, FP (Y: 126 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6094, PETRARCA (Y: 68 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6856, PETRARCA (Y: 70 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6308, PETRARCA (Y: 68 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6502, CUTLER (Y: 125 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05916 (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 180 PN 923, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 180 PN 2048, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1658, FP (Y: 126 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6094, PETRARCA (Y: 68 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6856, PETRARCA (Y: 70 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6308, PETRARCA (Y: 68 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 180 PN 1532, 2017 A6502, CUTLER (Y: 125 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05916 (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 180 PN 923, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-23 | House | Act No. 90 |
2018-10-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (194-0) |
2018-10-09 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-02 | House | In the House |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (48-0) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (126-65) |
2018-04-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-14 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1532 |
2018-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-06-20 | House | In the House |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-6) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |