PA SB171 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 15, 1933 (P.L.565, No.111), known as the Department of Banking Code, further providing for employee protection.
Title
Further providing for employee protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-17 - Senate - SB 171 PN 141, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Referred to COMMERCE | |
2009-03-17 | In the House | |
2009-03-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-16 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-10 | First consideration | |
2009-03-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-02 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |