PA SB1384 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the highway capital budget project itemization for the fiscal year 2014-2015 to be financed from current revenue or by the incurring of debt.
Title
Providing for the highway capital budget project itemization for the fiscal year 2014-2015 to be financed from current revenue or by the incurring of debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 129 |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-11 | House | In the House |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |