PA SB1355 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1984 (P.L.688, No.147), known as the Radiation Protection Act, in fees, further providing for nuclear facility and transport fees.
Title
In fees, further providing for nuclear facility and transport fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-27 | Senate | Act No. 190 |
2014-10-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-4) |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-23 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2014-06-10 | House | In the House |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |