PA SB1319 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions;
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions;
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A05560 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-09-07 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |