PA SB127 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in enforcement, providing for State income tax intercept.
Title
In enforcement, providing for State income tax intercept.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-12-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-12-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-07-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |