PA SB1267 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 74 (Transportation) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in traffic signals, further providing for definitions and for maintenance agreement; in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for traffic-control signals and for expiration of automated red light enforcement systems provisions; and, in taxes for highway maintenance and construction, further providing for allocation of proceeds.
Title
In traffic signals, further providing for definitions and for maintenance agreement; in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for traffic-control signals and for expiration of automated red light enforcement systems provisions; and, in taxes for highway maintenance and construction, further providing for allocation of proceeds.
Sponsors
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Sean Wiley [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - House - House Floor: SB 1267 PN 1987, FP (Y: 146 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1267 PN 1987, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - House - House Floor: SB 1267 PN 1987, FP (Y: 146 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1267 PN 1987, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-20 | House | Act No. 101 |
2016-07-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Signed in House |
2016-07-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-07-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (146-43) |
2016-07-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-07-10 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-07-10 | House | Second consideration |
2016-07-01 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-06-29 | House | In the House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-5) |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |