PA SB1265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for curriculum and training.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for curriculum and training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1265 PN 1703, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-10-18 | House | In the House |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |