PA SB1265 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1975 (P.L.604, No.173), entitled "An act to facilitate the use of electronic funds transfer systems by providing that credits to accounts in financial institutions designated by recipients shall satisfy legal requirements for payments by cash or checks," further providing for electronic funds transfers; providing for definitions; further providing for consumer protections; providing for payroll card accounts; and making editorial changes.
Title
Amending the act of December 19, 1975 (P.L.604, No.173), entitled "An act to facilitate the use of electronic funds transfer systems by providing that credits to accounts in financial institutions designated by recipients shall satisfy legal requirements for payments by cash or checks," further providing for electronic funds transfers; providing for definitions; further providing for consumer protections; providing for payroll card accounts; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Robert Tomlinson [R] |
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Scott Wagner [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1265 PN 2183, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 1265 PN 2183, FP (Y: 168 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 1265 PN 2088, 2015 A10468, GINGRICH (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A10287 (Y: 4 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A10284 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1265 PN 1974, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 1265 PN 2183, FP (Y: 168 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 1265 PN 2088, 2015 A10468, GINGRICH (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A10287 (Y: 4 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A10284 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1265 PN 1974, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | Act No. 161 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (45-3) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (168-19) |
2016-10-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-27 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-06-29 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2016-06-27 | House | In the House |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-6) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |