PA SB1265 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for an angel investment tax credit.
Title
Providing for an angel investment tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |