PA SB1252 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in intermediate units, providing for Retired Volunteer Educator Tutor Programs.
Title
In intermediate units, providing for Retired Volunteer Educator Tutor Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1252 PN 2012, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1252 PN 2012, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-10-21 | House | In the House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Vote by which this bill went over, reconsidered |
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |