PA SB1221 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 12, 2004 (P.L.73, No.11), known as the Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority Act for Cities of the Second Class, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in intergovernmental cooperation authority for cities of the second class, further providing for governing board, for powers and duties, for term of existence, for annual report to be filed and annual audits and providing for distribution of gaming revenue.
Title
Amending the act of February 12, 2004 (P.L.73, No.11), known as the Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority Act for Cities of the Second Class, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in intergovernmental cooperation authority for cities of the second class, further providing for governing board, for powers and duties, for term of existence, for annual report to be filed and annual audits and providing for distribution of gaming revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - House - House Floor: SB 1221 PN 1884, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1221 PN 1884, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - House - House Floor: SB 1221 PN 1884, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1221 PN 1884, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-20 | House | Act No. 99 |
2016-07-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Signed in House |
2016-07-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-07-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2016-07-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-07-10 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-07-10 | House | Second consideration |
2016-07-01 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-29 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2016-06-28 | House | In the House |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |