PA SB1203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-26 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-26 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act preventing the Commonwealth from dealing with persons associated with the Government of Russia or the Government of Belarus; and imposing duties on the Treasury Department and the Attorney General.
Title
Preventing the Commonwealth from dealing with persons associated with the Government of Russia or the Government of Belarus; and imposing duties on the Treasury Department and the Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1203 PN 1931, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1203 PN 1810, 2021 A5215, ARGALL Amendment No. A-5215 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A04701 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1203 PN 1810, 2021 A5215, ARGALL Amendment No. A-5215 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A04701 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-09-21 | House | In the House |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-1) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |