PA SB1171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 3 (Agriculture) and 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in nutrient management and odor management, further providing for the Nutrient Management Advisory Board; and, in Agricultural Advisory Board, further providing for establishment of board, for powers of board and for review of regulations.
Title
In nutrient management and odor management, further providing for the Nutrient Management Advisory Board; and, in Agricultural Advisory Board, further providing for establishment of board, for powers of board and for review of regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Scott Wagner [R] |
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1171 PN 2104, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 1171 PN 2104, FP (Y: 183 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1171 PN 2052, 2017 A10385, CAUSER (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-01 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A09630 (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1171 PN 1893, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 1171 PN 2104, FP (Y: 183 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1171 PN 2052, 2017 A10385, CAUSER (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-01 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A09630 (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1171 PN 1893, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 162 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (183-2) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2018-06-20 | House | In the House |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |