PA SB1167 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for legitimate cannabis-related business.
Title
Providing for legitimate cannabis-related business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04515 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04432 (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1167 PN 1551, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1167 PN 1525, 2021 A3856, DISANTO Amendment No. A-3856 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03794 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04515 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04432 (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1167 PN 1551, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1167 PN 1525, 2021 A3856, DISANTO Amendment No. A-3856 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03794 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2022-04-13 | House | In the House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-3) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Amended on second consideration (49-0) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |