PA SB1160 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Amended on third consideration (48-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Amended on third consideration (48-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions; and abrogating a regulation.
Title
Further providing for definitions; and abrogating a regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1160 PN 1812, 2021 A5527, BAKER Amendment No. A-5527 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A05035 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A05035 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (48-1) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |