PA SB1159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1585, No.174), known as the Private Licensed Schools Act, further providing for powers and duties of board.
Title
Further providing for powers and duties of board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |