PA SB1155 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in miscellaneous provisions relating to institutions of higher education, providing for Higher Education Task Force.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions relating to institutions of higher education, providing for Higher Education Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1155 PN 1714, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1155 PN 1560, 2023 A4850, ARGALL Amendment No. A-4850 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1155 PN 1560, 2023 A4850, ARGALL Amendment No. A-4850 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2024-06-11 | House | In the House |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-21) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (29-21) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |