PA SB1151 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-20 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-20 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1987 (P.L.246, No.47), known as the Municipalities Financial Recovery Act, further providing for purpose and legislative intent; providing for fiscal emergencies in third class cities and for receivership for third class cities; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for purpose and legislative intent; providing for fiscal emergencies in third class cities and for receivership for third class cities; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-19 - House - SB 1151 PN 1665, CONCUR (Y: 177 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1665, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - House - SB 1151 PN 1605, FP (Y: 185 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - House - SB 1151 PN 1605, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 181 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5135, FREEMAN (Y: 85 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5230, THOMAS (Y: 20 N: 175 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5224, THOMAS (Y: 84 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5218, THOMAS (Y: 79 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5242, GRELL (Y: 190 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1447, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4409, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-4409 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4404, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-4404 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4396, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-4396 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4412, PICCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-4412 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1665, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - House - SB 1151 PN 1605, FP (Y: 185 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - House - SB 1151 PN 1605, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 181 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5135, FREEMAN (Y: 85 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5230, THOMAS (Y: 20 N: 175 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5224, THOMAS (Y: 84 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5218, THOMAS (Y: 79 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - House - SB 1151 PN 1447, 2011 A5242, GRELL (Y: 190 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1447, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4409, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-4409 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4404, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-4404 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4396, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-4396 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-27 - Senate - SB 1151 PN 1435, A4412, PICCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-4412 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | House | Act No. 79 |
2011-10-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-10-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-10-19 | House | Signed in House |
2011-10-19 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-10-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (177-18) |
2011-10-19 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2011-10-19 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-10-18 | House | In the House |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (37-13) |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2011-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-9) |
2011-09-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-09-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-09-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-06-28 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2011-06-28 | House | In the House |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-21) |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-17 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |