PA SB115 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act No. 68 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act No. 68 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania a party to the Nurse Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.
Title
Making the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania a party to the Nurse Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 115 PN 473, FP (Y: 146 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 115 PN 473, 2021 A1555, GERMANE, LAWRENCE (Y: 93 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 115 PN 473, Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 115 PN 473, 2021 A9610, COLLETT Amendment No. A-0961 (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 115 PN 473, FP (Y: 146 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 115 PN 473, 2021 A1555, GERMANE, LAWRENCE (Y: 93 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 115 PN 473, Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 115 PN 473, 2021 A9610, COLLETT Amendment No. A-0961 (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Act No. 68 of 2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (146-55) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-05-12 | House | In the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-16) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |