PA SB1142 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 6, 1989 (P.L.169, No.32), known as the Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board.
Title
Further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Rob Teplitz [D] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1142 PN 1598, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2016-03-21 | House | In the House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |