PA SB1136 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in grounds and buildings, further providing for school police officers.
Title
In grounds and buildings, further providing for school police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1136 PN 1675, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-25 | House | In the House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |