PA SB1135 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for funding to address habitability concerns in owner-occupied and rental units, measures to improve energy or water efficiency and make units accessible for individuals with disabilities, and removing barriers to affordability of homeownership; establishing the Whole-Home Repairs and Homeownership Affordability Program, the Student Housing Repurpose Program, the Whole-Home Repairs and Homeownership Affordability Fund and the Housing Stabilization Initiative Fund; and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Commonwealth Financing Authority.
Title
Providing for funding to address habitability concerns in owner-occupied and rental units, measures to improve energy or water efficiency and make units accessible for individuals with disabilities, and removing barriers to affordability of homeownership; establishing the Whole-Home Repairs and Homeownership Affordability Program, the Student Housing Repurpose Program, the Whole-Home Repairs and Homeownership Affordability Fund and the Housing Stabilization Initiative Fund; and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Commonwealth Financing Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05337 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Adopt Amendment A04832 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Adopt Amendment A04832 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |