PA SB1135 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for tests of certain electronic devices.
Title
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for tests of certain electronic devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-18 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-12-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-12-11 | Second consideration | |
2007-12-10 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-11-28 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-11-27 | First consideration | |
2007-11-27 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-19 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1135 |