PA SB1123 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 157 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 157 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other required equipment, further providing for flashing or revolving yellow and white lights.
Title
In other required equipment, further providing for flashing or revolving yellow and white lights.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Amanda Cappelletti [D] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1123 PN 1916, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 1123 PN 1916, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05569 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1123 PN 1463, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 1123 PN 1916, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05569 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1123 PN 1463, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 157 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-10-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-10-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-7) |
2022-10-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-19 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-07-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-07-07 | House | In the House |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |