PA SB1118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019.
Title
Making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |