PA SB1113 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams; and, in State Board of Education, further providing for powers and duties of the board.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams; and, in State Board of Education, further providing for powers and duties of the board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-21 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |