PA SB109 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Act No. 1 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Act No. 1 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency finance and tax provisions, further providing for declaration of policy and providing for nontaxability of certain income; in emergency COVID-19 response, establishing the Hospitality Industry Recovery Program, providing for emergency education relief to nonpublic schools and for emergency education relief to educational entities and repealing provisions relating to Pennsylvania Housing Finance Agency; establishing the Rental and Utility Assistance Grant Program; in additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for Workers' Compensation Security Fund transfer to COVID-19 Response Restricted Account; in 2020-2021 Restrictions on Appropriations for Funds and Accounts, further providing for fund transfers; and making appropriations.
Title
In emergency finance and tax provisions, further providing for declaration of policy and providing for nontaxability of certain income; in emergency COVID-19 response, establishing the Hospitality Industry Recovery Program, providing for emergency education relief to nonpublic schools and for emergency education relief to educational entities and repealing provisions relating to Pennsylvania Housing Finance Agency; establishing the Rental and Utility Assistance Grant Program; in additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for Workers' Compensation Security Fund transfer to COVID-19 Response Restricted Account; in 2020-2021 Restrictions on Appropriations for Funds and Accounts, further providing for fund transfers; and making appropriations.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 109 PN 144, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Floor: SB 109 PN 144, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00297 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 109 PN 102, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 109 PN 102, 2021 A2050, SAVAL Amendment No. A-0205 (Y: 21 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 109 PN 144, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Floor: SB 109 PN 144, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00297 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 109 PN 102, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 109 PN 102, 2021 A2050, SAVAL Amendment No. A-0205 (Y: 21 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Act No. 1 of 2021 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2021-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2021-02-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-02-03 | House | Second consideration |
2021-01-28 | House | Removed from table |
2021-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-01-27 | House | In the House |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-23 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |