PA SB1089 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Human Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for medical assistance payments and for admissions to drug and alcohol facilities.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of Human Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for medical assistance payments and for admissions to drug and alcohol facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |