PA SB1077 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to LABOR RELATIONS
Pending: House Labor Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to LABOR RELATIONS
Pending: House Labor Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, further providing for manufactured housing; adding provisions relating to residential buildings with log walls; and providing for a report by the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee.
Title
Further providing for manufactured housing; adding provisions relating to residential buildings with log walls; and providing for a report by the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - SB 1077 PN 1681, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS | |
2010-03-08 | In the House | |
2010-03-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-09 | Second consideration | |
2010-02-08 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-02-02 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-02-01 | Amended on second consideration | |
2009-12-15 | First consideration | |
2009-12-15 | Reported as amended | |
2009-09-02 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |