PA SB1070 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-22 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-22 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating Route 611, from Main Street in the Village of Tobyhanna to Interstate 380 in Coolbaugh Township, Monroe County, as the Trooper Joshua D. Miller Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating Route 611, from Main Street in the Village of Tobyhanna to Interstate 380 in Coolbaugh Township, Monroe County, as the Trooper Joshua D. Miller Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-07 - House - SB 1070 PN 1372, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-17 - Senate - SB 1070 PN 1372, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-17 - Senate - SB 1070 PN 1372, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-22 | Act No. 55 | |
2009-12-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-12-16 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-12-16 | Signed in House | |
2009-12-15 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-12-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-11-17 | Second consideration | |
2009-11-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-10-01 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-10-01 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-30 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-30 | First consideration | |
2009-09-30 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-21 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-09-17 | In the House | |
2009-09-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-09-15 | Second consideration | |
2009-09-14 | First consideration | |
2009-09-14 | Reported as committed | |
2009-08-07 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |