PA SB1063 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over the Two Lick Creek, Borough of Clymer, Indiana County, as the Corporal Louis R. Tate Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over the Two Lick Creek, Borough of Clymer, Indiana County, as the Corporal Louis R. Tate Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |