PA SB1060 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 7A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 7A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Title
Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - SB 1060 PN 1196, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - SB 1060 PN 1196, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - SB 1060 PN 1196, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | House | Act No. 7A |
2011-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2011-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2011-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-06-07 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-06 | House | In the House |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |