PA SB1059 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021.
Title
Making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |