PA SB1046 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Act No. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Act No. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania National Guard, further providing for retired Pennsylvania National Guard personnel.
Title
In Pennsylvania National Guard, further providing for retired Pennsylvania National Guard personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Floor: SB 1046 PN 1357, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1046 PN 1357, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Floor: SB 1046 PN 1357, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1046 PN 1357, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | House | Act No. 83 |
2015-12-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-05 | House | Signed in House |
2015-12-04 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2015-12-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-01 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-01 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-11-19 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2015-11-18 | House | In the House |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |