PA SB1034 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for grant oversight.
Title
Providing for grant oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |