PA SB1031 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for conflicts of interest; and repealing and adding provisions relating to independent counsel.
Title
Providing for conflicts of interest; and repealing and adding provisions relating to independent counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1031 PN 1764, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-05-16 | House | In the House |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |