PA SB1030 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 24, 1966 (1965 P.L.1535, No.537), known as the Pennsylvania Sewage Facilities Act, further providing for official plans.
Title
Further providing for official plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1030 PN 1489, FP (Y: 136 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1030 PN 1489, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1030 PN 1489, FP (Y: 136 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1030 PN 1489, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Act No. 34 |
2020-06-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (136-66) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-20 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2020-04-28 | House | In the House |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |