PA SB1019 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1987 (P.L.220, No.39), known as the Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors Act, further providing for definitions, for license required, for State Board of Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors, for powers and functions of board, for qualifications for license, for procedures for licensing, for reciprocity, for endorsement of out-of-State licenses and for reinstatement of license; providing for restrictions on use of title "Licensed Associate Marriage and Family Therapist" and for restrictions on the use of title "Licensed Associate Professional Counselor"; further providing for license renewal and records and fees and for unlawful practice; and providing for effect of associate licensure.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for license required, for State Board of Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors, for powers and functions of board, for qualifications for license, for procedures for licensing, for reciprocity, for endorsement of out-of-State licenses and for reinstatement of license; providing for restrictions on use of title "Licensed Associate Marriage and Family Therapist" and for restrictions on the use of title "Licensed Associate Professional Counselor"; further providing for license renewal and records and fees and for unlawful practice; and providing for effect of associate licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-12-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |