PA SB1014 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for period of registration.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for period of registration.
Sponsors
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. John Sabatina [D] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-09-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |