PA SB100 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 132
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 132
Summary
An Act providing for the regulation of home improvement contracts and for the registration of certain contractors; prohibiting certain acts; and providing for penalties.
Title
An Act providing for the regulation of home improvement contracts and for the registration of certain contractors; prohibiting certain acts; and providing for penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-17 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-10-09 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-10-08 | Signed in House | |
2008-10-08 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-10-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2008-10-08 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2008-10-08 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2008-10-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-10-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-09-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-23 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-23 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-23 | First consideration | |
2008-09-23 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-20 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS | |
2007-06-05 | Final passage | |
2007-06-05 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2007-06-05 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-04 | Second consideration | |
2007-05-21 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-03-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-13 | First consideration | |
2007-03-13 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-02 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=100 |