PA HR933 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Adopted (178-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Adopted (178-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the observance of the Holy Month of Ramadan, a month of reflection and prayer for the Muslim community, which runs from sunset on May 15, 2018, through sunset on June 14, 2018.
Title
Recognizing the observance of the Holy Month of Ramadan, a month of reflection and prayer for the Muslim community, which runs from sunset on May 15, 2018, through sunset on June 14, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Adopted (178-0) |
2018-05-22 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |