PA HR823 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing and honoring the work and service of Brian A. Hudson as the executive director and chief executive officer of the Pennsylvania Housing Finance Agency.
Title
Recognizing and honoring the work and service of Brian A. Hudson as the executive director and chief executive officer of the Pennsylvania Housing Finance Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |