PA HR792 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Adopted, April 11, 2018 193-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Adopted, April 11, 2018 193-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing April 2, 2018, as "World Autism Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing April 2, 2018, as "World Autism Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Adopted, April 11, 2018 193-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |