PA HR698 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of February 2020 as "Black History Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of February 2020 as "Black History Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HR 698 PN 3216 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |