PA HR649 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of February 3 through 7, 2020, as "Tax Identity Theft Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the week of February 3 through 7, 2020, as "Tax Identity Theft Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HR 649 PN 3278 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04593 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04593 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to FINANCE |